House
|
08/05/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0781
|
|
|
House
|
08/05/2024
|
Effective Date August 5, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/05/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2024
|
Motion Withdrawn Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 086-020-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 086-020-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 086-020-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 014-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2024
|
Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 048-011-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2024
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Approved for Consideration Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Re-assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-031-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|