House
|
08/04/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0444
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/04/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|