House | 04/02/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Weber |