Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|