House | 02/29/2024 | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Rules Committee; Rep. Natalie A. Manley | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Ethics & Elections | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |