House | 05/19/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 05/19/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Appropriations-General Services Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |