House | 03/27/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-008-000 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2023 | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |