House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | To Business & Industry Innovation Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste |