House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Referred to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |