House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0352
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Education; 012-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 010-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; 010-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|