House
|
06/26/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Education; 014-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-024-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|