House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer
|
|
|
House
|
11/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
08/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Egofske
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy L. Grant
|
|
|