House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|