House
|
05/31/2023
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Third Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|