House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0353
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date July 28, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Waive Posting Notice
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Neil Anderson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Egofske
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|