House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0354
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 27, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 28, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|