House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |