House | 05/16/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | To Revenue - Tax Credit and Incentives Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |