House | 03/24/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William "Will" Davis | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Mental Health & Addiction Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Benton |