House
|
08/11/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0543
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Effective Date August 11, 2023
|
|
|
House
|
08/11/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 073-035-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 073-035-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 005-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 005-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 038-017-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 008-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 008-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-029-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Public Health Committee; 007-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 005-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|