Senate | 04/28/2023 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Assigned to Executive | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-017-002 | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Do Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 005-003-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |