Senate
|
11/20/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/19/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-034-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Higher Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|