House
|
07/28/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0357
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/28/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 100-007-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 037-020-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 009-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Do Pass Executive; 009-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Postponed - Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Police & Fire Committee; 008-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 009-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|