House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0203
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 26, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Do Pass Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Restorative Justice
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|