Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations- Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Appropriations- Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-040-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|