House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0208
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 034-020-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Do Pass Agriculture; 008-004-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Sponsor Removed Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Assigned to Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-034-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 007-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|