House | 05/19/2023 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 071-040-000 | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Human Services Committee; Rep. Robyn Gabel | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 19, 2023 | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/17/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cyril Nichols |