House
|
06/30/2023
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0212
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Effective Date January 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
06/30/2023
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Third Reading - Passed; 038-017-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Do Pass Education; 009-003-001
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 6, 2023
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-009-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 015-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|