House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 009-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Police & Fire Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Fritts
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|