Senate | 05/20/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 05/20/2024 | Arrive in Senate | ||
House | 05/17/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Matt Hanson | ||
House | 05/17/2024 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 | ||
House | 05/17/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 008-000-000 | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 10/18/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 08/22/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas |