House
|
05/31/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 31, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 27, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Appropriations-Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2023
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|