House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/22/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman | ||
House | 01/19/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Ozinga | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 11/03/2023 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. | ||
House | 11/03/2023 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |