House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|