Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|