House | 04/19/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Energy & Environment Committee | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 019-007-000 | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |