House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |