House | 04/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Ethics & Elections | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Ethics & Elections | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |