House | 04/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |