House | 04/05/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony M. McCombie |