House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0836
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
House Concurs
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Arrived in House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Seth Lewis
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 006-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments:
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-024-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jenn Ladisch Douglass
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
|
|
|