House
|
08/02/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0733
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass Financial Institutions; 007-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Porfirio
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Financial Institutions
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-035-002
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee; 008-001-001
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee; 007-003-001
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Financial Institutions and Licensing Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke
|
|
|