House
|
08/02/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0735
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Do Pass Education; 013-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Postponed - Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 091-019-001
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Blair-Sherlock
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 011-002-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|