House
|
08/02/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0738
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Effective Date August 2, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/02/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-001-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Assigned to State Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-008-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-001-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Referred to State Government Administration Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
|
|
|