Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-005-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|