House
|
08/09/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0848
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Effective Date January 1, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
08/09/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-002-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 21, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Do Pass Judiciary; 007-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Halpin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Benton
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 068-035-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-004-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock
|
|
|