House
|
07/01/2024
|
Effective Date July 1, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0606
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Assigned to Local Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Police & Fire Committee; 011-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Police & Fire Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Assigned to Police & Fire Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
|
|
|