Senate
|
06/26/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Do Pass Education; 011-000-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Assigned to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tom Bennett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 014-000-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer
|
|
|