House | 07/19/2024 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0697 | ||
House | 07/19/2024 | Effective Date January 1, 2025 | ||
House | 07/19/2024 | Governor Approved | ||
House | 06/13/2024 | Sent to the Governor | ||
House | 05/16/2024 | Passed Both Houses | ||
Senate | 05/16/2024 | Third Reading - Passed; 039-020-000 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2024 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2024 | Second Reading | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2024 | ||
Senate | 05/01/2024 | Do Pass Judiciary; 006-003-000 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Referred to Assignments | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Arrive in Senate | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-031-000 | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 011-003-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Housing | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |