House
|
08/07/2024
|
Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0786
|
|
|
House
|
08/07/2024
|
Effective Date August 7, 2024
|
|
|
House
|
08/07/2024
|
Governor Approved
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Passed Both Houses
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Third Reading - Passed; 038-019-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Second Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Do Pass Executive; 008-003-000
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Assigned to Executive
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Referred to Assignments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Arrive in Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-037-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Second Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 006-003-000
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Assigned to Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Referred to Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
|
|
|