House | 04/24/2024 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez | ||
House | 04/19/2024 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Second Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-010-000 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | Referred to Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2024 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar |